skip to content

Kwok-Liu, Josephine Po-Yee

CPSO#: 29730

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Dec 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Liu, Josephine Po-Yee Kwok (used until: 29 Feb 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Radiology
St Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y4
Phone: (905) 522-4941 Ext. 33308 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Imagus Inc Medical Imaging
25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite G 2-4-6
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (905) 528-1465
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Kwok-Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )

Business Address:
G2 - 4 - 6
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155


Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )
Dr. G. So ( CPSO# 76100 )
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )
Dr. C. Boylan ( CPSO# 78775 )
Dr. N. Muhn ( CPSO# 79555 )
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )
Dr. V. Leung ( CPSO# 93077 )
Dr. A. Alabousi ( CPSO# 95414 )
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )
Dr. O. Mironov ( CPSO# 107610)

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
G2 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
104- 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 389-0300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEPHINE PO-YEE KWOK-LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOK-LIU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1977