skip to content

Kim, Jinnie

CPSO#: 103681

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Mar 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416 530 6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Travis D. Carpenter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Carpenter ( CPSO# 97767 )
Dr. J. Kim ( CPSO# 103681)

Business Address:
General Internal Medicine
St. Joesph;s Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6084

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
General Internal Medicine Division
Room E209
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JINNIE KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
EL - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2017