skip to content

Keystone, Jay Stephen

CPSO#: 22911

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 03 Sep 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Sep 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 3-Sep-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jay Keystone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Keystone ( CPSO# 22911 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
13N-1347
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3671

Business Address:
Suite 1500
333 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5H 2R2
Phone Number: (416) 926-2698

Business Address:
Suite B400
284 Earl Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2H8

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 09 Apr 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1970
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 03 Sep 2019