skip to content

Juan, Joshua Vahid

CPSO#: 99047

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Francis Family Liver Clinic
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Norman Urquhart Wing 13th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-340-4679
Fax: 416-340-4533 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

CAREA Oshawa
115 Grassmere Avenue
Oshawa ON  L1H 3X7
Canada
Phone: (905) 723-0036
Fax: 905-7233391
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

115 Barrack St
Street Health Centre
Kingston ON  K7K 0B5
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-1440
Fax: 613.549.7986
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

40 Finchgate Blvd. Suite 224
Bloom clinic
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Canada
Phone: (905) 451-6959
Fax: (905) 451-0458
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

1450 Kingston Road, unit #17
Pickering ON  L1V 1C1
Canada
Phone: 905-428-1212
Fax: 905-420-3541
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1450 Kingston Road, unit #17
Pickering ON  L1V 1C1
Canada
Phone: 905-428-1212
Fax: 905-420-3541
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Ave
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-9471
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Henricus Leonardus Antonius Janssen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Janssen ( CPSO# 99771 )
Dr. J. Juan ( CPSO# 99047 )

Business Address:
Suite 9EB234
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 340-4172

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 234 (9 EB 234)
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4605

Business Address:
The Francis Family Liver Clinic
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street, 9th Floor Eaton Building
Room 215
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5375

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSHUA VAHID JUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2012