skip to content

Giddens, Jolyon David

CPSO#: 27350

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jun 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
1635 Lawrence Avenue west
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9
Phone: (416) 243-3300
Fax: (416) 244-1252 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. David Giddens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Giddens ( CPSO# 27350 )

Business Address:
ER
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2

Business Address:
554 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1J3

Business Address:
2245 Lawrence Avenue West
Etobicoke ON  M9P 3W3

Business Address:
2005 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M9N 3V4

Business Address:
5400 Steeles Avenue West
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9S1

Business Address:
202-1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9
Phone Number: (416) 243-3300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOLYON DAVID GIDDENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIDDENS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1975