First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 May 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 May 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2021 |