skip to content

Butchey, Janki

CPSO#: 50323

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jan 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Dec 1988
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
68 Birchmount Walk
London ON  N6K-4K5
Phone: (519) 657-2832
Fax: 5192048977 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

1051 Wonderland Rd S
London ON  N6K 3X4
Canada
Phone: (519) 472-2060
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Maurice Butchey and Dr. Janki Butchey Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Butchey ( CPSO# 23968 )
Dr. J. Butchey ( CPSO# 50323 )

Business Address:
1051 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 3X4
Phone Number: (519) 472-2060

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1988
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 1988

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 1988 Active
             Dr. Janki Butchey's certificate of registration is restricted to the practice
            of Psychiatry.