Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 May 2004
Summary:
On May 25, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bradford to have committed an act of professional misconduct in that he committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional for conducting an operation without the patient(s consent.
The Committee ordered the following:
1) That Dr. Bradford be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register.
2) That Dr. Bradford be suspended for one month commencing on July 1, 2004, and;
3) that Dr. Bradford pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 25, 2004
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Aug 2002
Summary:
On August 26, 2002, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Bradford committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, for an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Discipline Committee requires Dr. Bradford to attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding be included in the register.
The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Bradford(s certificate of registration for a period of one month starting on the following date: October 1, 2003.
The Discipline Committee orders the suspension of the one month suspension if Dr. Bradford takes at his own expense and successfully completes the following courses approved by the College: (a) medical record-keeping; (b) physician-patient communications; and (c) medical ethics and informed consent. The courses must be completed no later than the following date: September 30, 2003.
The Discipline Committee requires Dr. Bradford to pay part of the College(s costs to the College, fixed in the amount of $2,500.00 by the following date: November 30, 2002.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 26, 2002