skip to content

Benoit, Jean-Marc

CPSO#: 83720

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Sep 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education: McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
304-2175 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON  M2J 1W8
Phone: 647-341-4517 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1220 Place d'Orleans Blvd
Orleans, Ontario
Orleans Urgent Care Clinic
orleans K1C 7K3
Canada
Phone: 6138415389
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jean Marc Benoit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Benoit ( CPSO# 83720 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Nov 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:24 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEAN-MARC BENOIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENOIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2005

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Mark Jean Benoit’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Tribunal of the College. It is alleged that commencing approximately September 2020, Dr. Benoit engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his communications, including but not limited to communications on online/digital platforms, regarding the COVID-19 pandemic and related issues. This includes but is not limited to making misleading, incorrect or inflammatory statements about vaccinations, treatments and public health measures for COVID-19, and unprofessional comments directed at others; and allegations that Dr. Benoit is incompetent in relation to his communications, outlined above.

It is also alleged that commencing approximately May 2022, Dr. Benoit engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to disclosing College investigative materials, including by posting materials online and failing to remove them upon request.

It is further alleged that in the course of the investigation, Dr. Benoit engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in failing to cooperate with the College’s investigation, including by failing to provide information in response to written inquiries.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)