skip to content

Aziza, Jonathan

CPSO#: 54826

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1984

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8107
Fax: (416) 431-8141 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: 905-683-2320 Ext. 1123
Fax: 905-428-5280
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

MAHC Huntsville
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Canada
Phone: 705-789-0022
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Canada
Phone: 705-645-4404
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

1815 Ironstone Manor
Suite 158
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9
Canada
Fax: 905-831-1806
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Scarborough Health Network
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: 416-495-2400 Ext. 5368
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough Health Network
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-284-8131 Ext. 4134
Fax: 416-281-7359
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jonathan Aziza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Aziza ( CPSO# 54826 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4B9

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3

Business Address:
Suite 158
1815 Ironstone Manor
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9

Business Address:
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7


Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Budisin ( CPSO# 77508 )
Dr. L. Gilloteaux ( CPSO# 81765 )
Dr. M. Shoichet ( CPSO# 88856 )
Dr. J. Woodley-Cook ( CPSO# 90936 )
Dr. R. Clemens ( CPSO# 50261 )
Dr. B. Shuckett ( CPSO# 33666 )
Dr. J. Aziza ( CPSO# 54826 )
Dr. S. Kundu ( CPSO# 68121 )
Dr. J. Nazareno ( CPSO# 77684 )

Business Address:
UVM Health Network-CVPH
Radiology Department
75 Beekman Street
Plattsburgh NY  129 1

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite G03
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Street East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JONATHAN AZIZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1984