skip to content

Izadpanah, Parnam

CPSO#: 89572

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital gate
Oakville ON  L6J 3L7
Phone: (905) 338-4372
Fax: (905) 338-4372 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Izadpanah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Izadpanah ( CPSO# 89572 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:31 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PARNAM IZADPANAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IZADPANAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jun 2011 to 31 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2014