skip to content

Israel, James Albert

CPSO#: 21300

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Dec 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Dec 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James A. Israel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 8 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 250 Lions Gate, Waterloo ON N2L 6M5
Date Received: 09 Dec 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Dec 2017