skip to content

Ismail, Said Osman

CPSO#: 87986

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Apr 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Somalian

Education:National University of Somalia, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58726 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Said O. Ismail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ismail ( CPSO# 87986 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
89 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
Health Sciences North Sudbury
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:15 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAID OSMAN ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2010