skip to content

Ismail, Abdel-Raouf

CPSO#: 28956

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Aug 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Queensway west
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-9228
Fax: (905) 897-7780 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 Burnhamthorpe Road West,Suite343
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Canada
Phone: 905-273-4888
Fax: 905-273-5581
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2200 Dundas st. East, unit 4A
Mississauga ON  L4X 2V3
Canada
Phone: (905)232-0720
Fax: (905)232-0790
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Abdel-Raouf Ismail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ismail ( CPSO# 28956 )

Business Address:
4A-2200 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4X 2V3
Phone Number: (905) 232-0720

Business Address:
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-9228

Business Address:
Suite 343
50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Phone Number: (905) 273-4888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:01 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABDEL-RAOUF ISMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISMAIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1980