Islam, Md Ashiqul (CPSO#: 92111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Sep 2018

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Chittagong, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
222 Kinig Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 697-9770
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashiqul Islam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Islam ( CPSO# 92111 )

Business Address:
222 King Street East
Suite 108
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 697-9770

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 17 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 18 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 09 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 11 Oct 2018

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary: Dr. Md Ashiqul Islam (June 20, 2018) Allegations of Dr. Islam’s professional misconduct were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Islam, during a medical appointment in or about September 2017, he engaged in sexual abuse of and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards a patient, including by hugging and/or kissing her, including while she was partially clad, making remarks of a sexual and/or inappropriate nature to her, touching, moving, and/or lifting an item of her clothing without clinical indication or consent, and touching her breasts without clinical indication or consent. It is also alleged that Dr Islam engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in sending an inaccurate consultation letter regarding the patient in question to a colleague.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): September 16-19 + 23, 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
member Effective: 11 Oct 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 5, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Md Ashiqul Islam, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Islam to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        
                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. MD ASHIQUL ISLAM
                                          ("Dr. Islam")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Islam, certificate of registration number 92111, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that the College has referred to the Discipline
                  Committee, allegations that I engaged in sexual abuse of a patient and
                  that I engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct.  

            (4)   I, Dr. Islam, have read the Notice of Hearing dated June 20, 2018, which
                  sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's concern
                  about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking
                  in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.

            (6)   I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR
                  Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (7)   I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Islam, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (9)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Islam, undertake that I shall not engage in any professional
                        encounters, in person or otherwise ("Professional Encounter(s)"),
                        with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the
                        Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous presence and
                        under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a regulated
                        health professional acceptable to the College under paragraphs 9(b)
                        and (c) below, and unless the other requirements provided in this
                        Undertaking are fulfilled. For further clarity, I understand that I
                        must not be alone with any patient, for any length of time, during
                        any Professional Encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian
                        of the patient is also present. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking in respect of my office practice (Bowmanville
                        Clinic Site), attached hereto as Appendix "A" and understand what
                        is required of the Practice Monitor including, but not limited to:
                  
                        1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                              undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                        2.    remaining present or at all times during all Professional
                              Encounters with all patients; 
                  
                        3.    carefully observing all of my Professional Encounters with
                              patients, including but not limited to physical and internal
                              examinations.  I further acknowledge my obligation to ensure
                              the Practice Monitor's view of all of my Professional
                              Encounters with patients, including physical and internal
                              examinations, is unobstructed at all times; 
                  
                        4.    refraining from performing any other functions, except those
                              required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as
                              Appendix "A",  while observing me in all my Professional
                              Encounters with patients; 
                  
                        5.    maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with
                              patients in the form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix
                              "B" (the "Log");
                  
                        6.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                              patients noted in the Log; and
                  
                        7.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                              basis.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Supervising
                        Practice Monitor's undertaking in respect of my hospital-based
                        practice (Lakeridge Health - Clarington Site and Oshawa General
                        Site), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and understand what is
                        required of the Practice Monitor including, but not limited to:
                  
                        1.    providing reports (as described in the Supervising Practice
                              Monitor's undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly
                              basis; 
                  
                        2.    remaining present, or ensuring a nurse or respiratory
                              therapist ("Nurse/RT") remains present, at all times during
                              all Professional Encounters with all patients; 
                  
                        3.    carefully observing, or ensuring a Nurse/RT observes, all of
                              my Professional Encounters with patients, including but not
                              limited to physical and internal examinations.  I further
                              acknowledge my obligation to ensure the Practice Monitor's or
                              Nurse/RT's view of all of my Professional Encounters with
                              patients, including physical and internal examinations, is
                              unobstructed at all times; 
                  
                        4.    ensuring that any Nurse/RT who works in a hospital area where
                              I have Professional Encounters with patients has been
                              notified that I am not permitted to engage in any
                              Professional Encounters with patients of any age unless the
                              Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous presence
                              and under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a
                              regulated health professional; 
                  
                        5.    refraining from performing any other functions, or ensuring
                              the Nurse/RT so refrains, except those required in the
                              Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "C",
                              while observing me in all my Professional Encounters with
                              patients, except that the Practice Monitor or Nurse/RT may
                              assist in patient care if an emergency arises within a
                              Professional Encounter; 
                  
                        6.    maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with
                              patients in the form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix
                              "B" (the "Log");
                  
                        7.    initialing, or ensuring the Nurse/RT initials, all
                              corresponding entries in the records of patients noted in the
                              Log; and
                  
                        8.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                              basis.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Islam, undertake to maintain my own copy of the Log at all
                        times, and to make it available to the College upon request. 
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that I have advised the College of each and
                  every location that I practise or have privileges including, but not
                  limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)").  Going forward, I further
                  undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations at
                  least (7) days prior commencing practice at that location, and
                  acknowledge that the requirements in this Undertaking will apply to any
                  new Practice Location. If I will carry on an office- or clinic-based
                  practice at a new Practice Location, I acknowledge that the provisions of
                  paragraph 9(b) above describe the practice monitoring arrangements that
                  will be required at that location. If I will carry on a hospital-based
                  practice involving seeing in-patients and/or emergency department
                  patients at a new Practice Location, I acknowledge that the provisions of
                  paragraph 9(c) describe the practice monitoring arrangements that will be
                  required at that location.  

            (11)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Islam, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post a
                        sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms
                        where I treat patients, in a clearly visible and secure location,
                        in the form set out in Appendix "D" that states: "Dr. Islam must
                        not  have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with
                        patients, of any age, unless in the continuous presence and under
                        the continuous observation of a practice monitor acceptable to the
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.  Dr. Islam must not
                        be alone during any professional encounter with any patient.
                        Further information may be found on the College website at
                        www.cpso.on.ca". For greater certainty, I understand that the
                        requirement to post a sign does not apply to hospital units where I
                        have Professional Encounters with hospital patients.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Islam, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (11)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                        consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "D."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Islam, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (11)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Islam, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Islam, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (11)(b) prior to providing
                        services in the language(s) described in section (11)(d).
                  
            (12)  Notifying Patients 

                  (a)   With respect to patients with whom I have appointments that are
                        scheduled at least seven (7) days in advance at any Practice
                        Location, I, Dr. Islam, undertake to ensure that each patient is
                        directly notified, within seven (7) days after the appointment is
                        scheduled, of the details of the restriction described in section
                        (9)(b) or (c) (as applicable), above.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any chief(s) of staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities,
                  at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (16)  I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel
                  in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to
                  do so.

            (17)  I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that in the event of an appeal of any Order of
                  the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (18)  I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (20)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (20)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Islam is the subject of a referral to the Discipline
                              Committee into allegations of professional misconduct. As a
                              result of the referral:
                  
                              Dr. Islam must not engage in any professional encounters, in
                              person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any
                              jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the
                              continuous presence of a practice monitor who is acceptable
                              to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in
                              Dr. Islam's Undertaking with the College are fulfilled.  For
                              further clarity, Dr. Islam must not be alone with any patient
                              during any professional encounter.
                  
                              Dr. Islam shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination
                              rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, except
                              hospital units where he has professional encounters with
                              hospital patients. The sign must be in a clearly visible and
                              secure location, and state: "Dr. Islam must not have
                              professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with
                              patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence of a
                              practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and
                              Surgeons of Ontario.  Dr. Islam must not be alone with any
                              patient during any professional encounter. Further
                              information may be found on the College website at
                              www.cpso.on.ca".  
                  
                              If a patient has an appointment with Dr. Islam that is
                              scheduled at least seven days in advance, Dr. Islam must
                              ensure that the patient is directly notified of the
                              monitoring requirement within seven days after the
                              appointment is scheduled.  
                  
            C.    CONSENT

            (21)  I, Dr. Islam, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Islam, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "E".

            (23)  I, Dr. Islam, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient records by the College
                  and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (24)  I, Dr. Islam, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Practice Monitors and to all regulated
                  health professionals carrying out duties under the Supervising Practice
                  Monitor's undertaking:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (25)  I, Dr. Islam, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors and
                  all regulated health professionals carrying out duties under the
                  Supervising Practice Monitor's undertaking to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Practice Monitor's undertakings
                        set out at Appendix "A" or "C"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (26)  I, Dr. Islam, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (27)  I, Dr. Islam, give my irrevocable consent to all Chief(s) of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: October 5, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Md Ashiqul Islam to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 5, 2018:

Dr. Islam is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of professional misconduct. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Islam must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the continuous presence of a practice monitor who is acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Islam’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Islam must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Islam shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, except hospital units where he has professional encounters with hospital patients. The sign must be in a clearly visible and secure location, and state: “Dr. Islam must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Islam must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

If a patient has an appointment with Dr. Islam that is scheduled at least seven days in advance, Dr. Islam must ensure that the patient is directly notified of the monitoring requirement within seven days after the appointment is scheduled.