skip to content

Isenberg, Jonathan Richard

CPSO#: 91372

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
185 Fifth Street
Toronto ON  M8V 2Z5
Phone: (416) 252-6475 Ext. 1
Fax: (416) 252-6395 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2555 Dixie Road Unit 7
Mississauga L4Y 4C4
Canada
Phone: 9056027723
Fax: 9056025432
County: 
Electoral District: 

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JONATHAN RICHARD ISENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 02 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011