skip to content

Isayama, Tetsuya

CPSO#: 94689

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Feb 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kyoto Prefectural University Of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 17 Mar 2011
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017