skip to content

Irwin, William Francis

CPSO#: 27857

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jan 1985

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 288 Westdale Ave Kingston, ON K7L 4S7
Date Received: 03 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Aug 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020