skip to content

Irwin, Charles Newton

CPSO#: 21373

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Irwin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 9 2011

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Dr. Sean Gartner at: 519-576-1630.
Date Received: 02 Jan 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014