skip to content

Irvine, Thomas Richard

CPSO#: 90814

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
535 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E9
Phone: (519) 579-0350 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Thomas Irvine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Irvine ( CPSO# 90814 )

Business Address:
CML Health Care Inc
Suite 101
535 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E9
Phone Number: (519) 579-0350

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. THOMAS RICHARD IRVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRVINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011