skip to content

Irvine, Richard Alexander

CPSO#: 25701

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Oct 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Oct 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard A. Irvine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Irvine ( CPSO# 25701 )

Business Address:
1290 Oxford Street East
Unit 59E
London ON  N5Y 4W5
Phone Number: (519) 204-6204

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Apr 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Oct 2019

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Nov 2011
Summary:

 On November 15, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Richard Alexander Irvine committed an 
 act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to 
 the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
 regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
Dr. Irvine engaged in 
 prescribing to family members contrary to College policy; treating family members for conditions 
 which were not urgent; treating family members where other health care professionals were 
 available; and, treating family members and not taking steps to transfer their care to other 
 physicians.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	The Registrar suspend Dr. 
 Irvine's certificate of registration for a period of four (4) months, to commence December 1st, 
 2011.  
2.	Dr. Irvine appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3.	Dr. Irvine pay to the College 
 costs in the amount of $3,650.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 15, 2011

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: October 24, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Richard Alexander Irvine to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 24, 2019:

College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Irvine engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his family practice. In resolution of these investigations, Dr. Irvine resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)