skip to content

Irvine, Ian Gordon

CPSO#: 21256

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Mar 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1968
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 20 Jul 1996
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 19 Aug 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Jun 1996
Summary:

 In June 1996, Dr. Irvine pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct in that he engaged 
 in sexual impropriety with a patient, as defined in s. 29(30) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as 
 amended.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Irvine guilty of professional 
 misconduct.  Consequently the Committee imposed the following penalty:

1.	A reprimand, the fact 
 of which is to be recorded on the Register.

2.	A suspension of his certificate of registration 
 for six (6) months, five (5) months of which were to be suspended on a number of 
 conditions:

a)	Dr. Irvine was to see his treating psychiatrist until at least the end of 1996, or 
 later as deemed appropriate by the psychiatrist;

b)	Dr. Irvine was to consent to the treating 
 psychiatrist reporting to the College on his progress at the end of 1996;

c)	Dr. Irvine was to 
 perform a community service of an appropriate character acceptable to the College.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 06, 1996