skip to content

Irvine, George Murray

CPSO#: 23078

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 28-Aug-2016

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Sciences North 41 Ramsey Lake Road Sudbury, ON P3E 5J1
Date Received: 08 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014