skip to content

Ironside, Sarah Anne

CPSO#: 94145

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:29 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 05 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 05 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 05 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 30 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2019