skip to content

Irazuzta, Jorge Oscar Eugenio

CPSO#: 33205

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Catolica de Cordoba, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jorge Irazuzta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 5 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: 67 Kenilworth Avenue North, Hamilton, ON L8H 4R6
Date Received: 27 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015