skip to content

Iraji, Mandana

CPSO#: 86871

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 May 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 May 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Assyrian, English, Farsi, Spanish

Education:Universidad Techologica De Santiago, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
5 Quarry Ridge
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 792-4800
Fax: (705) 792-4009 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Regional Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Fax: (705) 728-9090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Stevenson Memorial hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R1W7
Canada
Phone: 705-435-6281
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mandana Iraji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Iraji ( CPSO# 86871 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 792-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MANDANA IRAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRAJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2011