skip to content

Iqbal, Salikah

CPSO#: 88814

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3630 Lawrence Ave E
Toronto ON  M1G1P6
Phone: (416) 901-6379
Fax: (647) 689-3546 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Iqbal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Iqbal ( CPSO# 88814 )

Business Address:
3630 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1G 1P6
Phone Number: (416) 901-6379

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SALIKAH IQBAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IQBAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013