skip to content

Iordache, Irina Liliana

CPSO#: 94359

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kipling Heights Medical Centre
2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale ON  M9W 4L6
Phone: (416) 741-4545 Ext. 226
Fax: (416) 744-1484 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 May 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IRINA LILIANA IORDACHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IORDACHE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011