skip to content

Ioannou, Kostas Panagiotis

CPSO#: 87120

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Ioannou, Panagiotis Kostas (used until: 06 Apr 2010 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Cardiologists
Suite 300-5
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 572
Fax: (905) 582-9966 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Electrophysiology Lab
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Suite 409 and 419
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Canada
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 572
Fax: (905)582-9966
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Noble Medical
002-10350 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5K9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kostas Ioannou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ioannou ( CPSO# 87120 )

Business Address:
002 - 10350 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5K9
Phone Number: (905) 237-5433

Business Address:
Suite 300-5
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KOSTAS PANAGIOTIS IOANNOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IOANNOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2012 to 16 Nov 2012
EL - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2012 to 11 Jan 2013
EL - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2016