skip to content

Iny, Robert

CPSO#: 88365

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Iny Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Quinte West Medical Center, 80 Catherine Street, Trenton, ON K8V 6N8
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015