skip to content

Inouye, Tetsuo

CPSO#: 26156

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 10 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jan 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: T. Inouye Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 13 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 1 800 775 0093 Fax: 647-933-2904 www.recordsregistry.ca
Instructions: Contact above
Date Received: 03 Dec 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Dec 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Dec 2014