skip to content

Okafor, Innocent Chukwudumebi

CPSO#: 86363

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 17 Feb 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Feb 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ibo, Yoruba

Education:University of Benin, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Innocent Chukwudumebi Okafor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Okafor ( CPSO# 86363 )

Business Address:
5085 Mayfield Road
Brampton ON  L6R 3S9
Phone Number: (905) 499-2857

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 19 Mar 2019

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Feb 2021
Summary:

On November 20, 2019, allegations of Dr. Okafor’s professional misconduct were 
referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It was alleged that Dr. Okafor 
engaged in sexual abuse of Patient A, and in disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional conduct with respect to Patient A and Patient B.  
 
The Discipline Committee held a hearing on October 26 to 28 and October 30, 2020 by 
way of videoconference in the presence of Dr. Okafor, his counsel and counsel for the 
College.  
 
In its decision released on February 17, 2021, the Committee found that Dr. Okafor 
engaged in sexual abuse of Patient A, and that he engaged in an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, 
with respect to Patient A and Patient B. Further, the Committee found that Dr. Okafor’s 
lack of cooperation with the College’s investigation also constituted disgraceful, 
dishonourable and unprofessional conduct. 
 
The Committee’s full reasons for decision on liability are available for review on the 
College website. 
 
Disposition 
 
Given the Committee’s findings, the Committee made an interim order for immediate 
suspension of Dr. Okafor’s certificate of registration, until such time as the Committee 
makes an order under subsection 51(5) or (5.2) of the Code. 
 
A penalty hearing is pending. 
 
Appeal 
 
On March 29, 2021, the College received Dr. Okafor’s Notice of Appeal dated March 25, 
2021, setting out Dr. Okafor’s intention to appeal the Discipline Committee’s February 
17, 2021 decision on finding to the Divisional Court.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): October 26 - 28 & 30, 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 19, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Innocent Chukwudumebi Okafor to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 19, 2019:

See attached PDF
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: March 19, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)