Ingves, Matthew Victor (CPSO#: 100493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5
Phone: (807) 345-5056
Fax: (888) 504-1696
Electoral District: 09

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW VICTOR INGVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INGVES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Vascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018