skip to content

Ingram, Diana Ruth

CPSO#: 31614

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 13 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1991 to 30 Sep 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Sep 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2004