skip to content

Ingber, Sarah Anne

CPSO#: 84807

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 334
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 498-4888
Fax: (647) 748-6770 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sarah A. Ingber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ingber ( CPSO# 84807 )

Business Address:
Suite 334
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 498-4888

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH ANNE INGBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INGBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010