skip to content

Inegbu, Ernest Chinonye

CPSO#: 99102

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nigeria, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Adult Critical Care Medicine
Room D2 5210
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 6B5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 76577 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERNEST CHINONYE INEGBU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INEGBU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013