skip to content

Imran, Aatika

CPSO#: 94183

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Quaid-i-Azam University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
358 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 1V7
Phone: (519) 438 0002
Fax: (519) 438 0888 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 7, 1355 Huron street
London ON  N5W2Z1
Canada
Phone: (519) 659 6399
Fax: 519-659-9930
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aatika Imran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Imran ( CPSO# 94183 )

Business Address:
358 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 1V7
Phone Number: (519) 438-0002

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AATIKA IMRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IMRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 08 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Oct 2010 to 07 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 08 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013