skip to content

Ilves, Riivo

CPSO#: 26597

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective:01 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014