skip to content

Ilnitsky, Sara Elizabeth

CPSO#: 106388

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: PCRM - Edmonton 3rd Floor 9888 Jasper Ave Edmonton AB T5J 5C6
Date Received: 24 Jul 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility Effective:24 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 Aug 2015
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 28 Sep 2015 to 11 Oct 2015
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Oct 2015 to 25 Oct 2015
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 2019