skip to content

Illamperuma, Chamani

CPSO#: 88034

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jan 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:University of Colombo, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
129 Church St South
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1W4
Phone: (905) 884-0977
Fax: (905) 884-6454 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. Illamperuma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Illamperuma ( CPSO# 88034 )

Business Address:
129 Church Street South
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1W4
Phone Number: (905) 884-0977

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0S7
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Jul 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHAMANI ILLAMPERUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILLAMPERUMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2008 to 30 Apr 2008
EL - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2008