skip to content

Ibrahim, Mohammed Aslam

CPSO#: 32023

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Oct 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Glasgow, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
2120 North Park Drive
brampton ontl6soc9
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 453-3251
Fax: (905) 453-9623 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.A. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2014
Corporation Name: Mohamed A. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ibrahim ( CPSO# 32023 )

Business Address:
Suite 216
2120 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 453-3251

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED ASLAM IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1980