skip to content

Ibrahim, Jawahir Ismail Abaker

CPSO#: 91290

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 207
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Phone: (613) 935-6414
Fax: (613) 935-8560 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAWAHIR ISMAIL ABAKER IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2010 to 30 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011