skip to content

Ibrahim, Hicham

CPSO#: 98628

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Manotick Medical Centre
5230 Mitch Owens Road
Manotick ON  K4M 1B2
Phone: (613) 692-2571
Fax: (613) 692-0271 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ibrahim ( CPSO# 98628 )

Business Address:
Manotick Medical Centre
5230 Mitch Owens Road
Manotick ON  K4M 1B2
Phone Number: (613) 692-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HICHAM IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014