skip to content

Ibrahim, Ezzeldin Saleh Mohamed

CPSO#: 88211

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Apr 2008 to 05 Jun 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 06 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009