skip to content

Ibrahim, Christine Mary Shoukry

CPSO#: 97558

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1371 Neilson Rd #314
Scarborough, ON
M1B 4Z8
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 901-8991
Fax: (416) 749-9959 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Admin Box #304
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-281-7375
Fax: 416-281-7020
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. C. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ibrahim ( CPSO# 97558 )

Business Address:
412-1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 281-9499

Business Address:
Medical Admin Box 304
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7375

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARY SHOUKRY IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016