Iannuzzi, Kaitlin Alexandra (CPSO#: 100733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
U of T Student Health Services
214 College St
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5T2Z9
Phone: 416-978-8030
Fax: 416-971-2089
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Rehabilitation
550 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAITLIN ALEXANDRA IANNUZZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IANNUZZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2016