skip to content

Ianni, Frank Aldo

CPSO#: 28754

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Sep 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University Of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Frank Ianni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain their medical record from Dr. Ianni's general practice may contact: Group Health Centre 240 McNabb Street Sault Ste. Marie, ON P6B 1Y5. Patients looking to obtain their medical record from Dr. Ianni's care of the elderly practice may contact: Algoma Geriatric Clinic Sault Area Hospital 750 Great Northern Road Sault Ste. Marie, ON P6B 0A8
Date Received: 18 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018