skip to content

Iancu, Daniela Elena

CPSO#: 97354

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Mar 2012
EXPIRY DATE
30 Apr 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHUM - 1001, St-Denis, porte 4905
suite D03.5462B
Montreal QC  H2X 3H9
Phone: 514 890-8000 Ext. 8450
Fax: 514 412-7547

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Daniela Iancu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:08 Mar 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:29 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Neuroradiology Effective:29 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Daniela Elena Iancu may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Diagnostic  Radiology,  University  of  Ottawa,  in which Dr. Iancu
                        holds  an academic appointment at the rank of Associate  Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate  of  registration automatically expires when Dr. Iancu no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


            Note: This certificate is issued  on  March  7,  2019, and expires on April 30,
                  2022.  Upon renewal of Dr. Iancu's academic appointment at the University
                  of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in
                  paragraph 2 above.