skip to content

Iakovleva, Gaiane Khatchatourovna

CPSO#: 85436

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Tyumen State Medical Academy, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Pathology
PO Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gaiane Iakovleva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Iakovleva ( CPSO# 85436 )

Business Address:
Oakville Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (647) 898-3695

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Pathology
PO Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7380

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GAIANE KHATCHATOUROVNA IAKOVLEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IAKOVLEVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 29 Aug 2006
PEAP - R - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 30 Aug 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2007