skip to content

yekinni, idris Olatunji

CPSO#: 110592

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Obafemi Awolowo University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Erie Shores Healthcare
194 Talbot St W
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 322-2424
Fax: (519) 322-2727 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Idris Yekinni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. i. yekinni ( CPSO# 110592)

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
3rd Floor
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2424


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba
New Brunswick
Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:20 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IDRIS OLATUNJI YEKINNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEKINNI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018